Admiral Sir Thomas Hugh Binney KCB KCMG DSO |
|
---|---|
16th Governor of Tasmania | |
In office 24 December 1945 – 8 May 1951 |
|
Monarch | George VI |
Preceded by | Sir Ernest Clark |
Succeeded by | Sir Ronald Cross |
Personal details | |
Born |
Thomas Hugh Binney 9 December 1883 Douglas, Isle of Man |
Died | 8 January 1953 Colchester, Essex |
(aged 69)
Nationality | British |
Awards |
Knight Commander of the Order of the Bath Knight Commander of the Order of St Michael and St George Distinguished Service Order |
Military service | |
Allegiance | United Kingdom |
Service/branch | Royal Navy |
Years of service | 1897–1945 |
Rank | Admiral |
Commands |
Commandant Royal College of Defence Studies 1st Battle Squadron HMS Hood HMS Nelson HMS Cardiff |
Battles/wars |
First World War Second World War |
Admiral Sir Thomas Hugh Binney KCB KCMG DSO (9 December 1883 – 8 January 1953) was a senior officer in the Royal Navy and Governor of Tasmania from 1945 to 1951.
Binney was born in Douglas, Isle of Man on 9 December 1883, the son of Thomas Godfrey Binney and his wife, Susan Lockhart.
Binney was determined to pursue a career with the Royal Navy from an early age, and he joined the training vessel HMS Britannia at Dartmouth at the age of 13.
He served at sea from 1899 until 1914, and was then aboard HMS Queen Elizabeth as a gunnery officer for the Dardanelles Campaign. Binney had been promoted to the rank of Commander by 1916, and was awarded the Distinguished Service Order in 1919. He was made Captain whilst on the China Station in 1922. He became Deputy Director of Plans at the Admiralty in 1925. He went on to be Flag Captain on HMS Nelson in 1928, Captain of HMS Hood in 1932 and Chief of Staff to Commander-in-Chief, Plymouth in 1933.